Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/27/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/27/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/27/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/13/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/24/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/14/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/25/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/05/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/05/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/18/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/14/2002