There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Water Infrastructure and Security Improvement Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to authorize appropriations for State water pollution control revolving funds, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/26/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/27/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/26/2002Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/06/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/06/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/06/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/06/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/07/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/07/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/07/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/12/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/12/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/12/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/13/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/19/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/10/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/23/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/06/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/26/2002 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/27/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3792. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2002)

Clean Water Infrastructure and Security Improvement Act of 2002 - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to remove certain requirements for States with respect to construction of treatment works under capitalization grant agreements.

Requires architectural and engineering contracts to be awarded consistent with procedures under the Federal Property and Administrative Services Act of 1949 or an equivalent State qualifications-based requirement.

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to assist States in establishing simplified procedures for small water systems to obtain assistance under the Act.

Requires revolving funds to be used only for providing assistance for activities which have as a principal benefit the improvement or protection of water quality of navigable waters. Makes revisions concerning uses of funds for: (1) innovative technologies; (2) administrative expenses; (3) small system technical, planning, and management assistance; and (4) financially distressed communities.

Revises requirements related to consistency with plans and eligibility of treatment works not considered publicly owned.

Requires States to make grants to financially distressed communities in any fiscal year in which the Administrator has more than $1.4 billion available for obligation and allows a State to give priority to such communities in making loans.

Allows a recipient of assistance from a State revolving fund to use the design-build project delivery (single contract) method.

Reauthorizes appropriations for FY 2003 through 2007 for the revolving fund program.