Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/26/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/28/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/28/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/28/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/28/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/28/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/05/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/05/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/07/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/07/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/07/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/07/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/14/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/14/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/14/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/19/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/19/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/19/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/09/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/09/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/09/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/16/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/16/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/18/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/25/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/25/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/25/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/14/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/14/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/15/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/21/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/22/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/22/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/05/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/06/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/11/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/21/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/21/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/10/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/04/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/04/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/18/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/25/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/25/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/16/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/13/2002