Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/27/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/14/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/12/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/24/2002