Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/28/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/28/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/07/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/07/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/20/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/20/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2002