Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/04/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/18/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/18/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/09/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/10/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/11/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/17/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/17/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/17/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/22/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/24/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/29/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/29/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/29/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/01/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/01/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/14/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/16/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/16/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/21/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/04/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/10/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/13/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/13/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/17/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/19/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/25/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/27/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/08/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/15/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/05/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/05/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/05/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/11/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/01/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/03/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/15/2002