Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/12/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/19/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/20/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/20/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/10/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/10/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/10/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/30/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/30/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/02/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/02/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/14/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/14/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/21/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/21/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/04/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/11/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/11/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/19/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/24/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/07/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/09/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/13/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/13/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/13/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/14/2002