Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/18/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/18/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/11/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/15/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/15/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/26/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/02/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/2002