There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the charter of the Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States organization to make members of the armed forces who receive special pay for duty subject to hostile fire or imminent danger eligible for membership in the organization, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-242. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2002Signed by President.
10/07/2002Presented to President.
10/02/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9858)
09/05/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
07/15/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4587)
07/12/2002Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-570.
03/04/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-242. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2002Signed by President.
10/07/2002HousePresented to President.
10/03/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/02/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9858)
09/05/2002SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
09/05/2002SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
09/05/2002SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/16/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/15/2002-2:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2002-2:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4587)
07/15/2002-2:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3838.
07/15/2002-2:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4587-4589)
07/15/2002-2:40pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/12/2002HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 191.
07/12/2002HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-570.
07/10/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/10/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/17/2002HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
04/17/2002HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
03/18/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/04/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/04/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/04/2002 Referred to
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-570
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims03/18/2002 Referred to
04/17/2002 Markup by
04/17/2002 Reported by
Senate Judiciary07/16/2002 Referred to
09/05/2002 Markup by
09/05/2002 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3838.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3838. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (07/12/2002)

Amends the charter of the Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States to make eligible for membership in such organization an individual who served honorably in an area which entitled such individual to hostile fire or imminent danger special pay.

Includes charitable activities within such organization's authorized purposes.