Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/06/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/06/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/19/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/19/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/19/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/10/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/16/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/20/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/22/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/22/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/10/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/12/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/18/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/18/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/24/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/24/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/24/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/26/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/08/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/09/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/09/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/15/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/15/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/18/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/18/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/22/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/22/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/22/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/22/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/22/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/23/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/25/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/04/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/19/2002