Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/07/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/07/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/17/2002