Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/18/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/18/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/18/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/18/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/18/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/20/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/20/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/11/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/24/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/24/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/06/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/06/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/06/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/20/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/20/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/20/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/25/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/22/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/12/2002