Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/13/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/13/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/20/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/18/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2002