Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/08/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/08/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/08/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/08/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/08/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/08/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/08/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/08/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/08/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/08/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/08/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/08/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/08/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/08/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/08/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/08/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/08/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/08/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/08/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/08/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/19/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 03/19/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/19/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/22/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/26/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/26/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/26/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/04/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/10/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew