Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/18/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/15/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/18/2002