There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Flight 93 National Memorial Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Flight 93 National Memorial Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a national memorial to commemorate the passengers and crew of Flight 93 who, on September 11, 2001, courageously gave their lives thereby thwarting a planned attack on our Nation's Capital, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/24/2002Became Public Law No: 107-226. (TXT | PDF)
09/24/2002Signed by President.
09/12/2002Presented to President.
09/10/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/2002Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8472)
07/22/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5002-5003)
07/22/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-597.
03/07/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
09/24/2002Became Public Law No: 107-226. (TXT | PDF)
09/24/2002Signed by President.
09/12/2002HousePresented to President.
09/11/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/10/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/2002SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8472)
07/23/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/22/2002-3:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2002-3:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5002-5003)
07/22/2002-3:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3917.
07/22/2002-3:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5002-5006)
07/22/2002-3:19pmHouseMrs. Cubin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/22/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 360.
07/22/2002HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-597.
07/12/2002HouseExecutive Comment Received from Interior.
07/10/2002HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands Discharged.
07/10/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/10/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/09/2002HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands
03/12/2002HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
03/12/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/07/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
03/07/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources03/07/2002 Referred to
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/22/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-597
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands03/12/2002 Referred to
07/09/2002 Hearings by
07/10/2002 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/23/2002 Referred to
09/10/2002 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (17)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3917. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/22/2002)

Flight 93 National Memorial Act - Establishes a memorial at the September 11, 2001, crash site of United Airlines Flight 93 in the Stonycreek Township, Somerset County, Pennsylvania, to honor the passengers and crew of Flight 93.

Establishes the Flight 93 Advisory Commission to: (1) make recommendations for the planning, design, construction, and long-term management of a permanent memorial; and (2) advise the Secretary of the Interior in the development of a management plan for the site.

States that the terrorists on United Flight 93 on September 11, 2001 shall not be considered passengers or crew of that flight.