Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/23/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/23/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/23/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/23/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/23/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/23/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/23/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/23/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/23/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/23/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/23/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/24/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/24/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/24/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/08/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/08/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/08/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/12/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/12/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/12/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/12/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/12/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/12/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/12/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/12/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/12/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/15/2002