Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/12/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/12/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/12/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/26/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/15/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/18/2002