Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/28/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/28/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/28/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/28/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/28/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/19/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/19/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/19/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/19/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/19/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/19/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/19/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/19/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/19/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/19/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/14/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/21/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/17/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/17/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/12/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 12/12/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/02/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/02/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/02/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/02/2002