Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/12/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2002