Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/13/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/13/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/13/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/11/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/22/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/12/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/11/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/03/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/04/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/04/2002