Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/10/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/10/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/09/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/09/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/09/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/04/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/04/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/11/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/19/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/19/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/20/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/20/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/20/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/20/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/21/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/24/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/27/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/18/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/09/2002