There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the President to present gold medals on behalf of the Congress to former President Jimmy Carter and his wife Rosalynn Carter in recognition of their service to the Nation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2001 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/02/2001 Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology and Economic Growth.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/06/2001 Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2001 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/08/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/08/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/08/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/29/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/29/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/29/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/13/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/06/2001 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology, and Economic Growth03/02/2001 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.399.

Subjects (9)

  • Carter Administration
  • Commemorations
  • Congressional gold medals
  • Ex-presidents
  • History
  • Presidential families

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.399. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2001)

Authorizes the President to present a gold medal on behalf of Congress to former President Jimmy Carter and his wife Rosalynn Carter in recognition of their service to the Nation.