Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/19/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/19/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/30/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/30/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/06/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/17/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/17/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/19/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/16/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/17/2002