Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/19/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/19/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/09/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/16/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/16/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/16/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/25/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/07/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/10/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/10/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/10/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/10/2002