Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/09/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/16/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/16/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/16/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/18/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/18/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/11/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/25/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/09/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/15/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/04/2002