Committees: H.R.4015 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/20/2002 Referred to
05/09/2002 Markup by
05/20/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-476
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits03/22/2002 Referred to
04/18/2002 Hearings by
05/02/2002 Markup by
05/02/2002 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2002 Referred to
10/15/2002 Discharged from