Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/10/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/16/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/17/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/17/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/17/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/01/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/02/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/07/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/07/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/20/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/21/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/04/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/17/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/19/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/24/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/2002
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/22/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/04/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/09/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/01/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/14/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/14/2002