Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/09/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/05/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/11/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/11/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/11/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/11/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/11/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/11/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/11/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/11/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/11/2002