Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/12/2002