Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/27/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/15/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/2002