Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/23/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/01/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/01/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/27/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2002