Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/20/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/15/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/15/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2002