There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Pet Safety and Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to ensure that all dogs and cats used by research facilities are obtained legally.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/26/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Horticulture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/20/2002Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/10/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/10/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/10/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/09/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture03/20/2002 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Horticulture03/26/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4039.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4039. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/2002)

Pet Safety and Protection Act - Amends the Animal Welfare Act regarding sources of research facility dogs and cats, to prohibit a research facility from using, or a person (as defined by this Act) from selling or donating, a dog or cat for research or education purposes that was not obtained from specified dealers, public pounds, owners, or Department of Agriculture-licensed research facilities. Establishes monetary penalties for related violations.