Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/10/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/10/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/10/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/09/2002