Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 10/01/2002