Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/25/2002