Refine your search

5 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/13/2002 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10962-10964; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S10962-10963; text as passed Senate: CR S10963-10964)
10/08/2002 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/04/2002 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3079-3080)
05/10/2002 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 107-453.
03/20/2002 Introduced in House