There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Popular Titles

Veterans' Benefits bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2002

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' and Survivors' Benefits Expansion Act of 2002

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' and Survivors' Benefits Expansion Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2002

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide a cost-of-living increase in the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disability and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses of such veterans, to expand certain benefits for veterans and their survivors, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2002, the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain service-connected disabled veterans, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to increase, effective as of December 1, 2002, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/23/2002Became Public Law No: 107-247. (TXT | PDF)
10/23/2002Signed by President.
10/11/2002Presented to President.
10/07/2002Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7122)
09/26/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2002Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 185).(text: CR 5/20/2002 H2624-2625)
05/16/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 107-472.
04/09/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/23/2002Became Public Law No: 107-247. (TXT | PDF)
10/23/2002Signed by President.
10/11/2002HousePresented to President.
10/07/2002-6:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/2002-6:04pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7122)
10/07/2002-5:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 4085.
10/07/2002-5:47pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H7122-7124)
09/30/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2002SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2002SenateS.Amdt.4837 Amendment SA 4837 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2002SenateS.Amdt.4837 Amendment SA 4837 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Rockefeller. (consideration: CR S9550; text: CR S9550) to propose a substitute.
09/26/2002SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9550)
09/26/2002SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/22/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2002-6:47pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2002-6:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2002-6:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 185). (text: CR 5/20/2002 H2624-2625)
05/21/2002-6:40pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2779-2780)
05/20/2002-3:01pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/20/2002-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4085.
05/20/2002-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2624-2628)
05/20/2002-2:45pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/16/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283.
05/16/2002HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 107-472.
05/09/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/09/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/02/2002HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
05/02/2002HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
05/01/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/09/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/09/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs04/09/2002 Referred to
05/09/2002 Markup by
05/16/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-472
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits05/01/2002 Referred to
05/02/2002 Markup by
05/02/2002 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2002 Referred to
09/26/2002 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4085. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/26/2002)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2002 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2002, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.