Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/09/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/10/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/11/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/2002