Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/10/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/17/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/23/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/24/2002