Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/10/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/11/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/16/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/16/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/24/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/29/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/01/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/11/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/07/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/07/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/09/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/12/2002