Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/18/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/22/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/06/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/23/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/25/2002