There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Presidential Records Act Amendments of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Presidential Records Act Amendments of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 22 of title 44, United States Code, popularly known as the Presidential Records Act, to establish procedures for the consideration of claims of constitutionally based privilege against disclosure of Presidential records.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/22/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 107-790.
04/11/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
11/22/2002Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 491.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 107-790.
10/09/2002Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/09/2002Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/12/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E511-512)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2002Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/23/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/01/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/08/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/08/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/20/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2002
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/23/2002 05/20/2002 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform04/11/2002 Referred to
10/09/2002 Markup by
11/22/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-790

No related bill information was received for H.R.4187.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4187. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (11/22/2002)

Presidential Records Act Amendments of 2002 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Presidential Records Act to require the Archivist of the United States, when making available any presidential record not previously made available publicly, to: (1) promptly provide written notice of such determination to the former President during whose term of office the record was created and the incumbent President; and (2) make the notice available to the public.

Requires such a record to be made available upon the expiration of the-20 day period (excepting Saturdays, Sundays, and legal public holidays) beginning on the date the Archivist provides notice, except any record with respect to which the Archivist receives notification of a claim of constitutionally based privilege against disclosure from a former or incumbent President.

Authorizes a former President or an incumbent President to extend the period for not more than 20 additional days by filing with the Archivist a statement that such an extension is necessary to allow an adequate review of the record. Provides that if the period, or any extension of that period, would otherwise expire between January 19 and July 20 of the year in which the incumbent President first takes office, then such period or extension shall expire on July 20 of that year.

Requires: (1) a claim of constitutionally based privilege against disclosure to be asserted personally by a former or incumbent President; and (2) a former or incumbent President to notify the Archivist, the House Committee on Government Reform, and the Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs of a privilege claim on the same day that the claim is asserted. Prohibits the Archivist from making publicly available a presidential record that is subject to a privilege claim asserted by a former President until the expiration of the 20-day period beginning on the date the Archivist is notified of the claim. Requires the Archivist, upon the expiration of such period, to make the record publicly available unless otherwise directed by a court order in an action initiated by the former President.

Prohibits the Archivist from making publicly available a presidential record that is subject to a privilege claim asserted by the incumbent President unless: (1) the incumbent President withdraws the privilege claim; or (2) the Archivist is otherwise directed by a final court order that is not subject to appeal. Makes this provision inapplicable with respect to any presidential record required to be made available: (1) pursuant to a subpoena or other judicial process issued by a court for purposes of a civil or criminal investigation; or (2) to either House of Congress because such records contain information needed for the conduct of business that is otherwise not available.

Directs the Archivist to adjust any otherwise applicable time period as necessary to comply with the return date of any congressional subpoena, judicial subpoena, or judicial process.

(Sec. 3) Provides that Executive Order number 13233, dated November 1, 2001 (establishing a process for review of presidential records and assertion of privilege claims) shall have no force or effect.