Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/18/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/18/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/18/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/18/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/18/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/18/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/18/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/18/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/23/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/25/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/30/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/30/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/30/2002