Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/28/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/28/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/28/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/28/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/06/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/13/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/26/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/20/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/18/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/18/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/09/2002