Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
05/28/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-10.
05/28/2001 Signed by President.
05/18/2001 Presented to President.
05/15/2001 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 113).(consideration: CR H2168-2170, H2173; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2168)
05/09/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/09/2001 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4584-4585)
04/24/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 86).(text: CR H1503)
02/06/2001 Introduced in House