Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/01/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/01/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/01/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/01/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/01/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/01/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/07/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/08/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/08/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/22/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/22/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/22/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/27/2001