Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/06/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/07/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/12/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/13/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/26/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/26/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/26/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/26/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/26/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/26/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/24/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/01/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2001