Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/01/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/08/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/10/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/13/2002